This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2020 at 00:09:09 (UTC).

BONNIE SONAODA HASSELFELD VS KELLY SCOTT

Case Summary

On 07/18/2007 BONNIE SONAODA HASSELFELD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KELLY SCOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROY L. PAUL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2275

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROY L. PAUL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASSELFELD BONNIE SONODA

Defendants

SCOTT KELLY

RONALD P. SLATES ESQ

Not Classified By Court

KOURI DENNETT F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOB B. KHAKSHOOY LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

RONALD P. SLATES ESQ

BARIC DRAGO C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Court's Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • Docketat 08:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Agreement (Full)) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • DocketStatement of Agreement (Full); Filed by Mediator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Continued by Stipulation) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2008
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by KELLY SCOTT (Defendant); ESQ RONALD P. SLATES (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DocketNotice-Assignment-Mediator; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2007
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2007
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2007
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department Legacy; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Application; Court Makes Order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • DocketOrder; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by BONNIE SONODA HASSELFELD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2007
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RONALD P. SLATES P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARIC, DRAGO C