This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2020 at 10:01:11 (UTC).

BO ZENGA VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2004 BO ZENGA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, ANTHONY J. MOHR, MICHAEL L. STERN, EMILIE H. ELIAS, ELIHU M. BERLE, AURELIO MUNOZ, PETER D. LICHTMAN, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, III, CARL J. WEST and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6459

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

ANTHONY J. MOHR

MICHAEL L. STERN

EMILIE H. ELIAS

ELIHU M. BERLE

AURELIO MUNOZ

PETER D. LICHTMAN

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, III

CARL J. WEST

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENGA BON

Defendants

ARNESON MARK

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

FIELDS BERT

GREENBERG GLUSKER FIELDS CLAMAN

GREY BRAD

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

PELLICANO ANTHONY #21568-112 CO1-19L

SAMAX ENTERPRISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KABATECK BROWN KELLNER LLP

DOVEL & LUNER LLP

Defendant Attorneys

JONES DAY

ROCKARD J. DELGADILLO CITY ATTORNEY

RODIGER LAW OFFICE

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

WRIGHT JOHN A. DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

EAGAN AVENATTI LLP

PILLSBURY WINTHROP SHAW PITTMAN LLP

ALSTON & BIRD LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

DAY JONES

AT&T SERVICES INC. LEGAL DEPARTMENT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL

4/23/2013: NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

4/24/2013: NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE DESIGNATING REPORTER?S TRANSCRIPT AND CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

5/24/2013: PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE DESIGNATING REPORTER?S TRANSCRIPT AND CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNAING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

6/6/2013: RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNAING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

6/11/2013: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL PER CRC RULE 8.124

NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

7/29/2013: NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

8/23/2013: NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

2/26/2014: NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK?S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

REMITTITUR

2/9/2015: REMITTITUR

Minute Order -

11/10/2016: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/10/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/23/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/23/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order - -

8/8/2017: Minute Order - -

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - -

8/8/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - -

Minute Order - -

10/4/2017: Minute Order - -

Request for Dismissal - -

12/4/2017: Request for Dismissal - -

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 323; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 323; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 323; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 323; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 323; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 323; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 323; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
290 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2004
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2004
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • DocketPROOFS OF SERVICE FOR SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bon Zenga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) INVASION OF PRIVACY; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant