This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2015 at 17:47:14 (UTC).

Bmw Financial Services Vs William D Youkstetter

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Bmw Financial Services against William D Youkstetter in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6641

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

John P. Shook

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bmw Financial Services Na

Land Rover Financial Services

Defendants

Greeen Jason

Green Jason

Youkstetter Dennis W.

Youkstetter William D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2002
  • Abstract of Judgment (5 ABSTRACTS ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2002
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDG BY DEFAULT BY CRT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • Declaration (OF REBECCA A. CALEY RE: SUMMARY OF CASE AND IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • Declaration (OF RHONDA L. JEWETT IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(d) ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2002
  • Notice (OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2001
  • Proof of Publication (Summons executed 11-8-01 at L.A. CA ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2001
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF REBECCA A. CALEY RE: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE WITH ORDER THEREON FOR JANUARY 28, 2002 AT 8:30 A.M IN DEPARTMENT 53) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2001
  • Notice (NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE OCTOBER 26, 2001 8:30 A.M. DEPT 53 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2001
  • Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2001
  • Order (For Pub. of Summ., Citation or Ntc. of Hrg. ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2001
  • Notice of Ruling (ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSESSI ON ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • Order for Writ of Possession (WILLIAM D. YOUKSTETTER AKA DENNIS W. YOUKSTETTER ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • Undertaking (FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • Proof of Service (William D. Youkstetter Summons; Complaint; Application Notice of Application; Memo. P&A's Declaration) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • Points and Authorities Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • Notice of Application (Notice of Application for Writ of Possession ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • Appl for Writ of Possession (C&D) (William D. Youkstetter ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • Declaration (Declaration of Rhonda L. Jewett ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • Supplemental Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Rebecca A. Caley ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.