This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2015 at 09:16:01 (UTC).

BIRRA T. ALLEMO ET. AL. VS. JESUS MARTINEZ ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2006 BIRRA T ALLEMO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE A. CONNOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0608

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JACQUELINE A. CONNOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLEMO BIRRA T.

NEMOMISSA BEKUMA B.

Defendants

DELTA LOGISTICS

DELTA LOGISTICS INC.

EXPRESSSHIPIT.COM

EXTRA EXPRESS

EXTRA EXPRESS(CERRITO'S) INC.

MARTINEZ JESUS

MIDNITE EXPRESS

MIDNITE EXPRESS INTERNATIONAL FREIGHT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEBRIEL GIRMA H.

Defendant Attorney

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2007
  • Request for Dismissal (AS TO ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Statement-Agreement (Full) Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2007
  • Notice-Settlement (AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2007
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2007
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2006
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (COURT DARK 11/27/06 CONT 12/5/06 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2006
  • Notice of Status Conference (ISC/OSC 11/27/06 JUDGE CONNOR REQUEST CMC STATEMENT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Extra Express, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Delta Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Midnite Express, Inc. is a litigant