This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 13:01:53 (UTC).

BETTY PIERSON VS CATHEDRAL OF LADY OF THE ANGELS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/25/2005 BETTY PIERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CATHEDRAL OF LADY OF THE ANGELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HELEN I. BENDIX. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0872

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HELEN I. BENDIX

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIERSON BETTY

Defendants

ARCHDIOCESE OF THE LOS ANGELES THE

CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS

Not Classified By Court

GELBLUM PETER B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATZ IRA N. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MCCUNE & HARBER LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2006
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2006
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 18; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 18; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 18; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Betty Pierson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2005
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Non-Agreement) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2005
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 18; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2005
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cathedral of our Lady of the Angels (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Betty Pierson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Betty Pierson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2005
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Betty Pierson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS A CORPORATION SOLE is a litigant