This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 15:07:23 (UTC).

AUDREY GIERO ET AL VS CONAIR CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2004 AUDREY GIERO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CONAIR CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5288

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIERO AUDREY

GIERO STANLEY

Defendants

BEN NYE CO INC

CONAIR CORPORATION

COSMETIC TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOC-

DR. MEHRON SKIN CARE PRODUCTS

ESTEE LAUDER INC

FROMM INTERNATIONAL-SOLIS USA

GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.

GILLETTE COMPANY

JOE BLASCO ENTERPRISES INC

JOE BLASCO MAKE-UP CENTER WEST INC

L'OREAL USA INC

L'OREAL USA S/D INC

MAX FACTOR & CO

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROCTOR & GAMBLE COMPANY INC

RAYOVAC CORPORATION A WISCONSIN CO.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIRM BERNHEIM LAW

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE KENNETH B. ESQ.

JUDY J. LAWRENCE ESQ.

MAYER KEVIN C. ESQ.

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

MURCHISON & CUMMING LAW OFFICES OF

BASSI MARTE J. ESQ.

MITCHELL SILBERBERG & KNUPP

RONK STEPHEN E.

LIU SANDY Y. ESQ.

SCHNABEL LAURENCE H. ESQ.

REED SMITH LLP

BAILEY PATRICK E. ESQ.

SEDGWICK DETERT MORAN & ARNOLD LAW O/O

STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

PALMERI RONALD JASON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2006
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 89; (Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 89; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 89; (Motion; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2006
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 89; (Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 89; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS SUPPORTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EVIDENCE AND ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
912 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2004
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by L'Oreal USA Inc (Defendant); L'Oreal USA S/D Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • DocketANSWER OF L'OREAL USA, INC. AND L'OREAL USA S/D, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • DocketMETROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2004
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Audrey Giero (Plaintiff); Stanley Giero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less