This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 09:32:07 (UTC).

ATLAS TRACKS INC VS RIBET ACADEMY

Case Summary

On 03/27/2001 ATLAS TRACKS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RIBET ACADEMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MADELEINE I. FLIER and GARY KLAUSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7570

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MADELEINE I. FLIER

GARY KLAUSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ATLAS TRACKS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION

JACQUES RIBET EDUCATION INC.

RIBET ACADEMY

RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATION ENRICHMENT FUND

WELFARE CORPORATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BOOTH MITCHEL & STRANGE LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

JOHNSON ROBERT M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2001
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2001
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 37, Madeleine I. Flier, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (FOR FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSALS) - OSC Discharged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2001
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (w/out prejudice complaint of Atlas Tracks, Inc. against Ribet Academy & Does 1-100 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2001
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 37, Madeleine I. Flier, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (RE FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSALS) - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2001
  • Docketin Department 1, Gary Klausner, Presiding; Order Re: Related Cases - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2001
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 37, Madeleine I. Flier, Presiding; Status Conference - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2001
  • Docketat 09:35 am in Department 37, Madeleine I. Flier, Presiding; OSC - No Return of Service (&/or osc re: default judgment oralternatively, status confernce;) - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2001
  • DocketDefault Entered (against Ribet Academy ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2001
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketNotice (of hearings; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1 to be Jacques Ribet Education, Inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 2 to be Ribet Academy Aducation Enrichment Fund, Inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIBET ACADEMY is a litigant

Latest cases where RIBET EDUCATION FUND INC is a litigant

Latest cases where JACQUES RIBET EDUCATION INC. DBA RIBET ACADEMY is a litigant