Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:42:22 (UTC).

ANGELA GARCIA VS W H SMITH OF NEVADA

Case Summary

On 09/20/2002 ANGELA GARCIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against W H SMITH OF NEVADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1905

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DE JESUS ELSIE

DE JESUS REYMUNDO

GARCIA ANGELA

GARCIA LEONOR

GARCIAL LUCILA

KARAS ZLATA

OBANDO BELMA

Defendants and Respondents

SMITH W.H.

W H SMITH OF NEVADA INC.

W H SMITH USA TRAVEL RETIAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOSS DENNIS F. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SKOGEN TONY R. ESQ.

SMITH ANN KANE ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2004
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (declaration of Daniel Rosenthal service list attached ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2004
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; APPROVAL - SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2004
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DANIEL ROSENTHAL; ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2004
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DANIEL ROSENTHAL RE: DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS TO CLAIMANTS ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketOrder (AND JUDGMENT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CLASS; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketJudgment ( FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2004
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; APPROVAL - SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ((FINAL)) - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • DocketDeclaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION & MEMO OF POINTS; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2003
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Status Conference continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2003
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (DISCLOSURE BY COUNSEL FOR PLTF ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2003
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in Supp.of Def.Mot.for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2003
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (Appendix of Federal Authorities in Supp.of Def.Mot.for Partial Judgm. on the Pleadings ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2003
  • DocketProof of Service (by Hand Delivery ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2003
  • DocketMotion (for Partial Judgment on Pleadings ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • DocketProof of Service (re: W.H. Smith of Nevada Inc. ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVEL TRADERS OF NEVADA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Skogen, Tony R Jr