This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 14:09:38 (UTC).

AMERICAN BEAUTY CONDOMINIUMS I OWNERS VS CESAR CONSTANTINO

Case Summary

On 03/30/2005 AMERICAN BEAUTY CONDOMINIUMS I OWNERS filed an Other lawsuit against CESAR CONSTANTINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1099

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AMERICAN BEAUTY CONDOMINIUMS I OWNERS

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CONSTANTINO CESAR

HERRERA LUCIA CONSTANTINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBAUM MARK J. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2005
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2005
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American Beauty Condominiums I Owners (Plaintiff); Canyon Oaks Homeowners Association (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2005
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by American Beauty Condominiums I Owners (Plaintiff); Canyon Oaks Homeowners Association (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2005
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2005
  • DocketANSWER TOC COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2005
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketPROOFS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS CESAR CONSTANTINO AND, ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Beauty Condominiums I Owners (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF COVENANTS; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less