This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2015 at 06:11:35 (UTC).

ALYSIA GOMEZ VS CAITLIN ELISA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 12/21/2005 ALYSIA GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAITLIN ELISA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK Y. JACKSON and ALAN S. ROSENFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6978

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK Y. JACKSON

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOCANEGRA CHERIE A MINOR

BOCANEGRA DESIREE A MINOR

BOCANEGRA FELICIA A MINOR

BOCANEGRA JULIAN A MINOR

BOCANEGRA LOUIS

GOMEZ ALYSIA

GOMEZ EMILY ESPERANZA A MINOR

GOMEZ JR. JORGE A MINOR

GOMEZ MARCOS A MINOR

Defendants

GARCIA CAITLIN ELISA

GARCIA DONNA

GARCIA SALVADOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARRIS ROBERT A.

Defendant Attorney

MCVERRY KEVIN PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2006
  • Recpt.of Depos.of Ord. to Dep.Mon. (AS TO FELICIA MONET BOCANEGRA, A MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • Recpt.of Depos.of Ord. to Dep.Mon. (AS TO CHERI MONIQUE BOCANEGRA, A MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • Recpt.of Depos.of Ord. to Dep.Mon. (AS TO MARCOS ANTONIO GOMEZ, A MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • Recpt.of Depos.of Ord. to Dep.Mon. (AS TO JORGE GOMEZ, A MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • Recpt.of Depos.of Ord. to Dep.Mon. (AS TO DESIREE BOCANEGRA, A MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • Recpt.of Depos.of Ord. to Dep.Mon. (AS TO EMILY ESPERANZA GOMEZ, A MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Miscellaneous-Other (EXPLANATION OF SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Order (TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FOR MINOR MARCOS ANTONIO GOMEZ IN THE AMT OF $2,500 - SIGNED BY JUDGE ROSENFIELD AND FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Order (APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM FOR MINOR MARCOS ANTONIO GOMEZ - SIGNED BY JUDGE ROSENFIELD AND FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Order (TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FOR MINOR JORGE GARCIA GOMEZ IN THE AMT OF $2,500 - SIGNED BY JUDGE ROSENFIELD AND FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2006
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (FOR MINOR MARCOS GOMEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (FOR MINOR EMILY ESPERANZA GOMEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (FOR MINOR DESIREE BOCANEGRA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (FOR MINOR FELICIA BOCANEGRA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (FOR MINOR JORGE GOMEZ, JR. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (FOR MINOR CHERIE BOCANEGRA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (FOR MINOR JULIAN BOCANEGRA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2005
  • Notice (CASE ASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2005
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2005
  • Notice-Case Management Conference (4-24-06, 8:30 A.M., DEPT. A16 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: MC016978    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 31

Motion to amend Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account is GRANTED.