This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2015 at 17:56:07 (UTC).

ALICIA DE LA CRUZ VS. SCOTCHMAN INDUSTRIES, INC., ET-AL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2001 ALICIA DE LA CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SCOTCHMAN INDUSTRIES, INC , ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSE HOM and LAW & MOTION. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4910

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSE HOM

LAW & MOTION

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE LA CRUZ ALICIA

DE LA CRUZ DAVID

DE LA CRUZ GOMEZ GABRIELA

DE LA CRUZ LUIS RICARDO

Defendants

JJS PALOMO'S STEEL

PALOMO JUAN M.

SAW SERVICE OF AMERICA INC.

SCOTCHMAN INDUSTRIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ERIC E. CASTELBLANCO A LAW CORPORATION

HELLER STEPHEN LAW OFFICES OF

SABZEVAR F. MICHAEL LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

BAGBY GAJDOS & ZACHARY

SIMMONS DALLAS LAW OFFICES OF .

TRESSLER SODERSTROM MALONEY & PRIESS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2002
  • Request for Dismissal (AS TO ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2002
  • Request for Dismissal (AS TO COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION OF AMEREICAN MOTORISTS INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2002
  • Notice of Ruling (AT MINORS COMPROMISE HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2002
  • Order (ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM (MINOR) Gabriela De La Cruz Gomez ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2002
  • Order (ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM (MINOR) David De La Cruz ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2002
  • Order (ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM (MINOR) Luis Ricardo De La Cruz ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • Stipulation (RE HEARING ON PETTITIONS TO APPROVE COMPROMISE ON MINORS CLAIMS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • Notice (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2002
  • Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2002
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2001
  • Proof of Services by Mail (JJS PALOMO'S STEEL, INC. 8560 SOMERSET BLVD PARAMOUNT, CA 90723 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • Proof of Services by Mail (JUAN PALOMO 8560 SOMERSET BLVD PARAMOUNT CA 90723 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • Proof of Services by Mail (CERTIFIED MAIL, PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED ON DEF SCOTCHMAN INDUSTRIES, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • Proof of Service (OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT JJS PALOMO'S STEEL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2001
  • Proof of Service (OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT JAY PALOMO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2001
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (Alicia De la Cruz appointed as G.A.L. for minor Luis Ricardo De La Cruz ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2001
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (Alicia De la Cruz appointed as G.A.L. for minor Gabriella De La Cruz Gomez ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2001
  • Petn & Ord Appointng GAL (Alicia De La Cruz appointed as G.A.L. for minor David De La Cruz ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2001
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAW SERVICES OF AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA - DALLAS SIMMONS