This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2015 at 15:27:00 (UTC).

ALEX ESPINOZA VS. COMBE INCORPORATED, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2007 ALEX ESPINOZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COMBE INCORPORATED, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSH M. FREDRICKS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0957

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSH M. FREDRICKS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOZA ALEX

Defendants

COMBE INCORPORATED

CVS PHARMACY INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

SAV-ON DRUGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESCANDARI & MICHON

Defendant Attorney

MURCHISON & CUMMING LAW OFFICES OF .

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2008
  • Request for Dismissal (W/PREJ, AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2007
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQ FOR JUDICIAL NTC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF SECOND AMND COMPLT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2007
  • Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FROM 11/2 THROUGH 11/15/07 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • Summons Filed (ON 2ND AMND COMPLT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • Second Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2007
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2007
  • Stipulation and Order (RE FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2007
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint ((UNVERIFIED) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: COMBE INCORPORATED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2007
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: CVS PHARMACY, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2007
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2007
  • Summons Filed (AMENDED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMBE INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where SAV-ON DRUGS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant