This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 17:37:00 (UTC).

ALAN REED VS. FAST LIN & MARK SAXON , DOES 1 TO 100

Case Summary

On 08/03/2007 ALAN REED filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FAST LIN MARK SAXON , DOES 1 TO 100. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. MILTON and JOSEPH DE VANON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9406

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. MILTON

JOSEPH DE VANON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED ALAN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

LIN FAST

SAXON MARK

JAMISON & ASSOCIATES

Not Classified By Court

KOMOROSKI CONSTANCE M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF BRENT ROSENZWEIG

LEVINE PAUL H. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

JAMISON & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department S, JOSEPH DE VANON, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (Re: Settlement) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2008
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department X; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2008
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department X; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2008
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department X, DAVID S. MILTON, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - MSC held - settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • DocketNotice (OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • DocketNotice; Filed by MARK SAXON (Defendant); JAMISON & ASSOCIATES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by ALAN REED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2008
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2007
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by ALAN REED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ALAN REED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamison & Associates, PLLC is a litigant