This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2020 at 15:29:56 (UTC).

ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER VS PATTI SHAMILIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2004 ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATTI SHAMILIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, III and VICTOR GREENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1782

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, III

VICTOR GREENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC.

Defendants and Respondents

MURODYAN VARDAN

MURODYAN VARTAN

PREZ SHAMILIAN

SHAMILIAN PATTI

V.G. JEWELRY

VARTANS JEWELRY

SHAMILIAN PREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALTAXE GEORGE LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketCase File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketMissing at time of scanning

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2005
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 35; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 35; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 35; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2004
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2004
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2004
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2004
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONVERSION AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2004
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Abe Abrahamoff Diamond Importer, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC. is a litigant