This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2020 at 07:50:21 (UTC).

6423 WILSHIRE BLVD LLC VS VICTORY PLACE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2005 6423 WILSHIRE BLVD LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against VICTORY PLACE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN I. BENDIX, DAVID YAFFE, RONALD M. SOHIGIAN and CHARLES W. MCCOY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4713

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HELEN I. BENDIX

DAVID YAFFE

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

CHARLES W. MCCOY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

6423 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD LLC

Defendants

6401 WILSHIRE BLVD. LLC

VICTORY PLACE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DICKER HOWARD W. ESQ.

STEIN TAMAR C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ARNONE JAMES L. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 18; Status Conference (Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 18; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2006
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 6423 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2006
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 18; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 18; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by 6423 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 18; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by 6423 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • Docketat 11:40 AM in Department 1; (Order ReReassignment of Case; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 41; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2005
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2005
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST THE HONORABLE RONALD M SOHIGIAN; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 6423 Wilshire Boulevard, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 6401 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARNONE JAMES L. ESQ.