This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2016 at 16:02:58 (UTC).

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS. PREMIER FOOD AND OILS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2010 ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PREMIER FOOD AND OILS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3973

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ENVIRONMENTAL PACKAGING TECHNOLOGIES LTD

PREMIER FOOD AND OILS COMPANY

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

WAVES LOGISTICS CORPORATION

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STOLT NEILSEN USA INC.

DTI ASSOCIATES LLC (MOE 1)

SAENI BEHROUZ (ROE 1)

ENVIRONMENTAL PACKAGING TECHNOLOGIES LTD

PREMIER FOOD AND OILS COMPANY

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SAENI BEHROUZ

FRANCIS-MUSTOE & COMPANY (ROE 2)

WAVES LOGISTICS CORPORATION

ROES 1-50

STARKIST CO.

CHUNG MIN LINERBAGS (HUI ZHOU) LTD

STARKIST CO. (MOE 3)

ROES 1 TO 20

DOES 1-50

MOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

BULK TRANSPORATATION (MOE 2)

ROES 100-150 INCLUSIVE

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COZEN O'CONNOR

Defendant Attorneys

COLEMAN AND ASSOCIATES

POOLE & SHAFFERY LLP

RICHARD S. PRICE III

WEST & MIYAMOTO

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & KLEIN LLP

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS O'HAGAN

Cross Defendant Attorneys

FLYNN DELICH & WISE LLP

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

TAUBMAN SIMPSON YOUNG & SULENTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2011
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • Appl & Ord for Refund of Jury Fees Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice as to entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (with prejudice as to cross- complaint by Environmental Packaging Technologies, LTD filed on 4/15/10 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • Notice ( OF TAKING 8/16/11 MOTION OFF CALENDAR ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS- COMPLAINT BY PREMIER FOOD & OILS COMPANY FILED 3/2/10 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT AS TO PREMIER FOOD & OILS COMPANY IN EXCHANGE FOR A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MTN IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE UNAUTHENTICATED INVOICES FOR CLEAN UP ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MTN IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE REGARDING INDUSTRY CUSTOM AND PRACTICE IN FILLING LINER BAGS ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2010
  • Notice (OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • Proof of Service (OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • Summons Filed (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • Summons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less