This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 18:47:03 (UTC).

ZULEMA ARGOTA VS GLENDALE FAMILY YMCA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/22/2014 ZULEMA ARGOTA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GLENDALE FAMILY YMCA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6493

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARGOTA ZULEMA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

GEDVIG ED

GLENDALE FAMILY Y.M.C.A.

GLENDALE Y.M.C.A

Y.M.C.A. OF GLENDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

REISNER & KING LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

5/22/2014: SUMMONS -

COMIPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) SEX/GENDER HARASSMENT, VIOLATION OF CAL. COV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

5/22/2014: COMIPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) SEX/GENDER HARASSMENT, VIOLATION OF CAL. COV. CODE ? 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/27/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/8/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7/14/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

7/21/2014: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Docketin Department 46, Frederick C. Shaller, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prej. complaint entire action ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YMCA OF GLENDALE is a litigant