Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 13:39:54 (UTC).

ZORAN ROSINI VS ADRIANA M LANTING ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2015 ZORAN ROSINI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ADRIANA M LANTING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0086

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZORAN ROSINI - INDIV

INDIV ZORAN ROSINI -

Defendants

ADRIANA M LANTING INDIV & TRUSTEE

ALL PERSONS UNK CLAIMING ANY LEGAL...

DOES 1 - 50 INC.

ADRIANA LANTING-TRST AML LIVING TRST 2/26

LEGAL... ALL PERSONS UNK CLAIMING ANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CZECH & HOWELL

Defendant Attorney

MICHELE A DOBSON LAW OFFICE OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2017
  • Notice (PLNTF - ROSINI RELEASE OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ( LIS PENDENS ) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Notice; Filed by ZORAN ROSINI - INDIV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Ntc of Withdrawal as Atty of Rec (deft - LANTING - NOTICE OF WITHDRWAL OF ATTY OF RECORD #2 (is blank ) states sent notice to adriana lan ting); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Ntc of Withdrawal as Attorney of Rec; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Proof of Service (POS OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT OF DEF ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • at 2:30 PM in Department S27; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • at 02:30 pm in Department SOS27, Ross Klein, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order (RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENTSEE MINUTE ORDER OF 12-6-16) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by ADRIANA M LANTING INDIV & TRUSTEE (Defendant); ADRIANA LANTING-TRST AML LIVING TRST 2/26 (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Motion to Strike (DEFT - ADRIANA LANTING - INDIV; ADRIANA LANTING - TRUSTEE.. MO 2 OF 2:: 8-25-15 MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO ANTI -SLAPP MOTION TO THE ORIGINAL COMP ATTY - DOBSON); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Default Entered (PLNTF- ZORAN ROSINI DEFAULT BY PLAINTIFF ON DEFT. 1- ADRIANA M LANTING INDIVIDUALLY & AS A TRUSTEE OF THE ADRIANA M LA NTING LIVING TRUST DATED 2-26-9 ** VACATED & SET ASIDE ****); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Default Entered; Filed by ZORAN ROSINI - INDIV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S.SUMMONS, COMP P.S. ADRIANA M LANTING, INDIV & AS TRUSTEE OF ADRIANA M LANTING LI VING TRUST 2-26-9 SERVED- SAME 5-26-15 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ZORAN ROSINI - INDIV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Summons Filed (ORIGINAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by ZORAN ROSINI - INDIV (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less