This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 13:51:23 (UTC).

ZOHAR LLC ET AL VS ALEXIO TRABULSI

Case Summary

On 06/30/2009 ZOHAR LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALEXIO TRABULSI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN, TERRY A. GREEN and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6916

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

TERRY A. GREEN

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SILVA VERONICA

ZOHAR LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

TRABULSI ALEXIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

COGGAN JAY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

10/9/2009: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/30/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY

6/30/2009: COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWL OF PENDENCY; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTON; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 14, Terry A. Green, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 14, Terry A. Green, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter is heard, matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • Docketat 02:12 pm in Department 1, ELIHU M. BERLE, Presiding; Order Re: Reassignment of Case (170.6 PLTFF) - Transferred to different departmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • DocketNotice (of pendency of action (lis pendens) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • Docketat 11:00 am in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (ALEXIO TRABULSI ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (FILED ALEXIO TRABULSI ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketNotice of Conference Date (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 STERN ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZOHAR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COGGAN JAY MARSHALL