This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 14:37:26 (UTC).

ZICRON CORPORATION ET AL VS CHARLES CULVERHOUSE

Case Summary

On 01/09/2009 ZICRON CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CHARLES CULVERHOUSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Other - Voided.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5277

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Other - Voided

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BEUZIERON LILO

TYREE PRESTON

ZICRON CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

CULVERHOUSE CHARLES

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OLESK JAAK ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department 28, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court makes order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZICRON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLESK JAAK ESQ.