This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:59:39 (UTC).

ZEV WEINSTEIN VS ISAAC BLUMBERG, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 ZEV WEINSTEIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ISAAC BLUMBERG, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6011

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEINSTEIN ZEV

Defendants

RIBNER EYTAN

BLUMBERG RIBNER INC.

BLUMBERG ISAAC

BLUMBERG ISSAC DBA ISSAC BLUMBERG CPA

ISAAC BLUMBERG CPA'S

CPA'S ISAAC BLUMBERG

Not Classified By Court

ZEBROWSKI HONORABLE JOHN

HONORABLE JOHN ZEBROWSKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAUM MICHAEL C.

LEBOVITS MOSES

DANIELS FINE ISRAEL SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS

Defendant Attorneys

WOLF WALLENSTEIN & ABRAMS

ELLEN K. WOLF

WOLF ELLEN K.

 

Court Documents

Declaration

5/13/2019: Declaration

Motion in Limine

7/12/2019: Motion in Limine

Summons

6/20/2016: Summons

Legacy Document

8/5/2016: Legacy Document

Reply

7/20/2018: Reply

Objection

7/20/2018: Objection

Ex Parte Application

8/20/2018: Ex Parte Application

Reply

9/13/2018: Reply

Reply

9/13/2018: Reply

Reply

9/13/2018: Reply

Exhibit List

9/14/2018: Exhibit List

Special Verdict

9/14/2018: Special Verdict

Notice

9/17/2018: Notice

Response

10/15/2018: Response

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/26/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice

11/26/2018: Notice

Opposition

12/12/2018: Opposition

Motion in Limine

2/13/2019: Motion in Limine

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Compel (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order on Parties Stipulation to Advance Hearings) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Zev Weinstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO NOTICE FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL; DECLARATION OF MOSES LEBOVITS); Filed by Zev Weinstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department P; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Ex Parte Application set for 8/12/19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order on Parties Stipulation to Advance Hearings); Filed by Issac Blumberg (Defendant); Eytan Ribner (Defendant); Blumberg Ribner, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketDefendants' Proposed Statement of the Case; Filed by Issac Blumberg (Defendant); Eytan Ribner (Defendant); Blumberg Ribner, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
643 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Zev Weinstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Zev Weinstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ERRATA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Zev Weinstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zev Weinstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC126011    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: P

 

Zev Weinstein v. Isaac Blumberg et al., Case No. SC126011

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Production of Documents

Hearing Date 11/15/2019

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiff seeks to compel defendants to produce his email communications from the morning of February 17, 2016. Plaintiff asserts these emails will prove he was working at home that day, contrary to defendants’ assertion that his employment had terminated.

On July 25, 2019, plaintiff served defendants with a notice for production of documents at trial under Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. §1987(c). Defendants objected on the grounds that they are burdensome or oppressive and/or request defendants to produce documents which do not exist.

Under Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. §1987(c), a court may compel production of items to which objection was made “unless the objecting party or person establishes good cause for nonproduction[.]”

Defendants state, after a thorough search, only one email responsive to plaintiff’s discovery requests was found, and it will be produced at trial. Antoine Declaration at ¶ 5. Plaintiff claims he sent and/or received 50-100 emails that morning. Reply at pg. 2:18. The court cannot determine which party is correct based on the proffered evidence. Defendants provide no evidence regarding what search was done, how, by whom, etc. Antoine’s declaration merely states plaintiff’s counsel was informed of the search. The court notes, however, that producing emails sent to/from plaintiff on one date is not burdensome. The only issue is whether defendant has conducted a thorough and complete search of the email servers, etc.

The court requires such information to rule on the motion. Defendants to provide a sworn declaration(s) outlining how the search was conducted, by whom, etc. and stating the results of the search. This information to be provided to the court within 7 days.