This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2016 at 13:47:49 (UTC).

ZALMAN NEMTZOV VS SHERI NEMTZOV

Case Summary

On 04/16/2014 ZALMAN NEMTZOV filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHERI NEMTZOV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA A. BEAUDET, ELIA WEINBACH, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and ANTHONY J. MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2834

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA A. BEAUDET

ELIA WEINBACH

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

ANTHONY J. MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEMTZOV ZALMAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

NEMTZOV SHERI

BROWN RALPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PEASE EDGAR B. III ESQ.

KELLY FERNANDEZ & KARNEY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CUNEO & HOOVER LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/1/2015: Unknown

Minute Order

9/17/2015: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF ZALMAN NEMTZOV'S DECLARATION AND MEMORANDUM FILED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/17/2015: PLAINTIFF ZALMAN NEMTZOV'S DECLARATION AND MEMORANDUM FILED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/4/2015: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

Proof of Service

11/13/2015: Proof of Service

[PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

11/16/2015: [PROPOSED] JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

[PROPOSED] JURY INSTRUCTIONS DISPUTED BY DEFENDANT

11/16/2015: [PROPOSED] JURY INSTRUCTIONS DISPUTED BY DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5- MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REGARDING COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANGELA PIERCE DI DONATO; REQUEST FOR JUDIC

11/16/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5- MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REGARDING COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANGELA PIERCE DI DONATO; REQUEST FOR JUDIC

JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

11/16/2015: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

Proof of Service

11/17/2015: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

11/19/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

Minute Order

11/20/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/15/2016: Minute Order

STIPULATION, RECEIPT AND ORDER RE RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS

1/20/2016: STIPULATION, RECEIPT AND ORDER RE RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS

Minute Order

3/10/2016: Minute Order

Proof of Service

7/20/2016: Proof of Service

Minute Order

11/14/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/14/2016: Minute Order

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • Stipulation (RECEIPT AND ORDER RE:RELEASE OF CIVIL EXHIBITS ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Reply to Opposition (RE: COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING OF 1/20/16 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Objection Document (TO COURT'S TENTATIVE DECISION OF JANUARY 20, 2016 AND REQUEST FOR A HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Stipulation ( RECEIPT AND ORDER RE RELEASE OF EXHIBITS ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Brief (REVISED TRIAL BRIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Request (for accommodations ) Filed by Applicant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Stip & Order-use CSR (DOMINICA TOCHKISS,CSR#12805 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Notice of Lodging Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2015
  • Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES: FSC: 11/20/15 TRIAL: 12/3/15 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO CONT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Opposition Document ( TO APPL TO CONT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Notice-Related Cases (to LD066386 (Dept. 1 to make ruling) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (AS TO JUDGE BEAUDET ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

® ® [ RGNV

EDGAR B. PEASE III, ESQ. SBN 159919 LAW OFFICES OF EDGAR B. PEASE III

1149 N. Gower St., Ste. 254 Suner: FILED HOLLYWOOD, CA 90038-1801 Connelourt of California Telephone: (323) 785-2131 . S1 of Los Angeles Fax: [3123) 785-2132 | DEC 0 1 2015

E-mail: “edgarpease@gmail.com” Sherri K,

Attorney for Plaintiff, By

ZALMAN NEMTZOV

e, Executive Officer/Cler);

Ishayla Chambers Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE C.OUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CENTRAL DISTRICT

Case No.: BC 542 834 ZALMAN NEMTZOV, an individual [Assigned for all purposes to the to the Honorable Michelle Williams Court, - Dept. 92]

Plaintiff,

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 - MOTION

FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REGARDING

PLAINTIFF’s COMPLAINT

SHERI NEMTZOV, an individual

Defendant.

Date: December 3, 2015 Time: 8:30 a.m. Dept.: 92

emm—" “—— “m—— “m—— “m—— “m— “m—n “m—mm “m—— “—

TO THIS COURT, HON. MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT AND ALL INTERESTED PARTIES: | Plaintiff Zalman Nemtzov hereby proffers this Opposition to Defendant Sheri Nemtzov’s Motion in Limine No. 5 on the following bases: |

1. Defendant’s Motion in Limine No. 5 is a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings which should be properly noticed and not brought in the form and without proper notice as it was;

2. Defendant’s Request for Judicial Notice 1s improper for a Motion in Limine; 1

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 - MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS