This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2016 at 04:21:06 (UTC).

ZACK FRANKLIN VS ESMERALDA FRANKLIN

Case Summary

On 12/31/2014 ZACK FRANKLIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ESMERALDA FRANKLIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOFER, RALPH, ITO, PATRICIA M and SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6199

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOFER, RALPH

ITO, PATRICIA M

SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRANKLIN ZACK

Respondent

FRANKLIN ESMERALDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REBEIL CRISTINA

Respondent Attorney

GONZALEZ LAURA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2016
  • Notice-Continuance Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Request-Trial Setting Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Receipt Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Request-Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Application-Ex Parte (by Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Order (by Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2014
  • Application-Ex Parte Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Miscellaneous Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Petition-Dissolution Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Declaration-Re Notice- Given Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Declaration-Property Instructions Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Notice Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Application-Ex-Parte-and Order Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ LAURA EVA