This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 11:03:57 (UTC).

ZACHARY E BLUM VS ROEM BUILDERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/21/2014 ZACHARY E BLUM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROEM BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3725

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BLUM ZACHARY E.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

FAME SANTA MONICA SENIOR APARTMENTS

ROEM BUILDERS INC.

SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT CO DBA (S/J)

MARK COMPANY (OF SANTA ANA CREEK ETC.)

ROEM-ICON CONTRACTING GROUP INC. (DOE 1)

MARK COMPANY OF SANTA ANA CREEK ETC.

ROEM-ICON CONTRACTING GROUP INC. DOE 1

SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT CO DBA S/J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRANECKE LAW GROUP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TAUREK MICHAEL T.

HOLTZ CRAIG A. LAW OFFICE OF

MORROW & WHITE

BOOTH JASON M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine - Exclude Collateral Source Benefits

1/2/2018: Motion in Limine - Exclude Collateral Source Benefits

Motion in Limine - General Excluding Testimony

1/2/2018: Motion in Limine - General Excluding Testimony

Motion in Limine - Exclude Tests, etc.

1/2/2018: Motion in Limine - Exclude Tests, etc.

Minute Order -

1/11/2018: Minute Order -

Notice of Settlement -

1/11/2018: Notice of Settlement -

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF FAME SANTA MONICA SENIOR APARTMENTS L.P.

6/9/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF FAME SANTA MONICA SENIOR APARTMENTS L.P.

CROSS-DEFENDANT SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT CO DBA MARK COMPANY SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

4/3/2015: CROSS-DEFENDANT SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT CO DBA MARK COMPANY SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

NOTICE OF RULING

4/21/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/15/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DECLARATION OF KRIS JACHASBANIAN

8/25/2015: DECLARATION OF KRIS JACHASBANIAN

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DEPARTMENT FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT CO DBA MARK COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/8/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DEPARTMENT FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT CO DBA MARK COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND EVIDENCE

11/4/2015: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND EVIDENCE

Minute Order -

12/4/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF

1/21/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF

Minute Order -

1/22/2016: Minute Order -

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF

2/10/2016: JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/4/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

MEMO OF COSTS ON APPEAL -

9/13/2017: MEMO OF COSTS ON APPEAL -

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 98; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 98; (Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Zachary E. Blum (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketMotion in Limine Exclude Unlicensed Motorcycle Driver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketMotion in Limine; Filed by Zachary E. Blum (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Zachary E. Blum (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Zachary E. Blum (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Zachary E. Blum (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Zachary E. Blum (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • DocketNtc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROEM-ICON CONTRACTING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FAME SANTA MONICA SENIOR APARTMENTS L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA MARK COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant