This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:51:57 (UTC).

YVONNE DELGADO VS MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 YVONNE DELGADO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD FRUIN and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9973

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD FRUIN

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DELGADO YVONNE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GALLAGHER MARYANN P. ESQ.

MARYANN P. GALLAGHER LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.

O'NEIL OLIVAREZ MADRUGA LEMIEUX

GIBEAUT MAHAN & BRISCOE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REASONABLE ACCOMMODATION; ETC

11/2/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REASONABLE ACCOMMODATION; ETC

SUMMONS

11/2/2015: SUMMONS

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6).

11/3/2015: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6).

Minute Order

11/5/2015: Minute Order

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

11/10/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/25/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

2/2/2016: Unknown

DECLARATION OF JULIE A. MULLANE PURSUANT TO CCP, SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

2/3/2016: DECLARATION OF JULIE A. MULLANE PURSUANT TO CCP, SECTION 430.41(A)(2)

Unknown

2/10/2016: Unknown

Unknown

2/17/2016: Unknown

Unknown

3/1/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

3/2/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/28/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

4/27/2016: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

FIRST AMMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/27/2016: FIRST AMMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Unknown

5/24/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/2/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Yvonne Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 46; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S REPORT ON OSC RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Yvonne Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 46; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Yvonne Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S REPORT ON OSC RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Yvonne Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 15; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Yvonne Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REASONABLE ACCOMMODATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Yvonne Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.