Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2020 at 17:19:23 (UTC).

YVETTE SMITH VS US AIRWAYS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/07/2008 YVETTE SMITH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against US AIRWAYS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JANE JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5153

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JANE JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SMITH YVETTE

Defendants and Respondents

CAPRIO PETER

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

RAMOS RAY

SMITH MIKE

US AIRWAYS INC.

WALRATH CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MESRIANI RODNEY ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MENDELSON LITTLER

DEUTSCH SHIRLEY D.

LITTLER MENDELSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Yvette Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • DocketNotice (COURT ORDER RE: DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 56; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 56, Jane Johnson, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 56, Jane Johnson, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status ( 2-Trial Setting Conference) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2008
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Peter Caprio (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • DocketDEFENDANT US AIRWAYS, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2008
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2008
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yvette Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. SEX DISCRIMINATION; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Airways, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEUTSCH SHIRLEY D.