Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2020 at 16:43:26 (UTC).

YUNG OK YI VS HANS BEVERLY AUTO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2016 YUNG OK YI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HANS BEVERLY AUTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO, BENNY C. OSORIO, GEORGINA T. RIZK, LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD and C. EDWARD SIMPSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1469

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

BENNY C. OSORIO

GEORGINA T. RIZK

LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD

C. EDWARD SIMPSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YI YUNG OK

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

BEVERLY PRESBYTERIAN KOREAN CHURCH

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

KANG SHIN WOOK M.D.

RIVER OF LIVING WATER CHURCH THE

HANS BEVERLY AUTO

BEVERLY PRESBYTERIAN KOREAN CHURCH (D/XD)

GABBAI BRUCE

4670 BEVERLY LLC (DOE 2)

LEE YOON MEE (DOE 1)

HANS BEVERLY AUTO SERVICE

D/XD BEVERLY PRESBYTERIAN KOREAN CHURCH

4670 BEVERLY LLC

LEE YOON MEE

THE RIVER OF LIVING WATER CHURCH

MOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

4670 BEVERLY LLC DOE 2

LEE YOON MEE DOE 1

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

RIVER OF LIVING WATER CHURCH THE

GABBAI BRUCE

4670 BEVERLY LLC (DOE 2)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN W. TOPPILA

LAW OFFICES OF TED B. WACKER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DAVID S. KIM & ASSOCIATES

CHANG DENNIS W. ESQ.

LUCAS TIMOTHY D.

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF SAUL REISS P.C.

LUCAS TIMOTHY DEAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCAS TIMOTHY D.

LAW OFFICES OF SAUL REISS P.C.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Jury Trial - Personal Injury) of 10/22/2018

10/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Jury Trial - Personal Injury) of 10/22/2018

Declaration - Declaration of Service

11/8/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Service

Declaration - Declaration of Stanley A. Calvert in Support of Motion to Strike and/or Tax Plaintiff`s Memorandum of Costs

11/21/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Stanley A. Calvert in Support of Motion to Strike and/or Tax Plaintiff`s Memorandum of Costs

Proof of Service by Mail

11/21/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/13/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Legacy Document -

10/2/2018: Legacy Document -

Minute Order - (Jury Trial - Personal Injury)

10/10/2018: Minute Order - (Jury Trial - Personal Injury)

Trial Brief -

9/6/2018: Trial Brief -

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY QUESTIONS DURING VOIR DIRE TO ELICIT A PROMISE OR PLEDGE FROM PROSPECTIVE JURORS OF BEING ABLE TO RETURN A SUBSTANTIAL VERDICT [MI

4/9/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY QUESTIONS DURING VOIR DIRE TO ELICIT A PROMISE OR PLEDGE FROM PROSPECTIVE JURORS OF BEING ABLE TO RETURN A SUBSTANTIAL VERDICT [MI

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION IN LIM1NE TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY OR EVIDENCE FROM LAY WITNESSES REGUARDING MEDICAL CONDITIONS, TREATMENTS OR DIAGNOSIS OF THE PLAINTIFF; ETC

4/9/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION IN LIM1NE TO EXCLUDE ANY TESTIMONY OR EVIDENCE FROM LAY WITNESSES REGUARDING MEDICAL CONDITIONS, TREATMENTS OR DIAGNOSIS OF THE PLAINTIFF; ETC

JOINT AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST

2/8/2018: JOINT AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/1/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

BEVERLY PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH'S ANSWER TO HANS BEVERLY AUTO SERVICE CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/16/2017: BEVERLY PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH'S ANSWER TO HANS BEVERLY AUTO SERVICE CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

3/3/2017: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

THE RIVER OF LIVING WATER CHURCH DBA BEVERLY PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY BRUCE GABBAI

5/11/2017: THE RIVER OF LIVING WATER CHURCH DBA BEVERLY PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY BRUCE GABBAI

SHIN WOOK KANG, M.D. ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY BRUCE GABBAI

5/11/2017: SHIN WOOK KANG, M.D. ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY BRUCE GABBAI

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE; DECLARATION OF ARMAN MATEVOSYAN, ESQ.

11/3/2017: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE; DECLARATION OF ARMAN MATEVOSYAN, ESQ.

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department NE3; Jury Trial (- Personal Injury) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Yung Ok Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Lee, Yoon Mee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Yung Ok Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department NE3; Order to Show Cause Re: (judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department NE3; Hearing on Motion to Strike (Cost) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department NE3; Hearing on Motion to Strike (and/or Tax Plaintiff`s Memorandum of Costs) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketRuling on Defendants, Lee and 4670 Beverly LLC's Motion to tax Yi's Costs and Plaintiff, Yi's Motion to Tax Gabbai's Costs; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
307 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Hans Beverly Auto Service (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hans Beverly Auto Service (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Yung Ok Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Yung Ok Yi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; 1. NEGLIGENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC621469    Hearing Date: March 22, 2021    Dept: 29

Yi  vs.  Hans Beverly Auto, et. al.

Court Order Re: Continuance of the March 22, 2021 Hearing to April 26, 2021;

On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Motion to Quash Writ of Execution on Money Judgment Obtained by Cross-Complainant Hans Beverly Auto Against Cross-Defendant's Bank of Hope, Filed by Cross-Defendant The River of Living Water Church dba Beverly Presbyterian Korean Church scheduled for 03/22/2021 is advanced to this date and continued to 04/26/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department 29 at Spring Street Courthouse.

Moving Party is ordered to give notice and file proof of service of said notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCAS TIMOTHY D.