This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 07:51:12 (UTC).

YOU SHEN VS. UNIVERSITY AND PROFESSIONAL STUDIES INSTITUTE

Case Summary

On 08/27/2015 YOU SHEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNIVERSITY AND PROFESSIONAL STUDIES INSTITUTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4021

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEN YOU

Defendants

JACKSON SHAWN TAM

LIN KAREN

PRIME US EDUCATION

UNIVERSITY AND PROFESSIONAL STUDIES

WEI ALICE YINING

UPSI

LI EASON

WEI YINING

JACKSON SHAWN

LI YIXIN

EDUCATION PRIME US

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGUEZ DARIN R. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

AIHUI SU

MICHAEL L. YEUNG

CHANG MATTERN LLP

YEUNG MICHAEL L.

SU AIHUI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by You Shen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Shawn Tam Jackson (Defendant); Shawn Jackson (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by You Shen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by You Shen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by You Shen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Order; Filed by You Shen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by You Shen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • Motion; Filed by Shawn Tam Jackson (Defendant); Shawn Jackson (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Yixin Li (Legacy Party); Prime US Education (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by Yixin Li (Legacy Party); Prime US Education (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Alice Yining Wei (Defendant); Yining Wei (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Alice Yining Wei (Defendant); Yining Wei (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by You Shen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.