This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 12:35:04 (UTC).

YOSHIHARA, KENICHI - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 YOSHIHARA, KENICHI - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STRATTON, MARIA E. and PAUL, ROY L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1027

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STRATTON, MARIA E.

PAUL, ROY L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORI DE YOSHIHARA MARTHA HIROKO

Decedent

YOSHIHARA KENICHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EBERT JAMES ROBERT

 

Court Documents

PR_General Probate

6/6/2016: PR_General Probate

Petition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial)

6/6/2016: Petition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial)

Notice - Hearing

6/7/2016: Notice - Hearing

Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Notice Of Spousal Property Petition By Elisa Yoshihara

7/8/2016: Waiver - (No Fee) - Of Notice Of Spousal Property Petition By Elisa Yoshihara

Supplement - To Petition

7/8/2016: Supplement - To Petition

Minute Order

7/12/2016: Minute Order

Supplement - Second

8/3/2016: Supplement - Second

Minute Order

8/10/2016: Minute Order

Order - Spousal Property

8/18/2016: Order - Spousal Property

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketOrder - Spousal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Paul, Roy L., Presiding; Spousal Property Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketSupplement (Second ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Spousal Property Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Of Notice Of Spousal Property Petition By Elisa Yoshihara ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketSupplement (To Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketPetition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less