This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 01:26:34 (UTC).

YORK RISK SERVICES GROUP VS CHANG W HU

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 YORK RISK SERVICES GROUP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHANG W HU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4612

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YORK RISK SERVICES GROUP

Defendants and Respondents

HU CHANG W

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL SULLIVAN & ASSOCIATES LLP

Defendant Attorney

WADE EDMOND D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/21/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR REIMBURSEMENT FOR WORKERS' COMPENSATION EXPENDITURES

12/21/2016: COMPLAINT FOR REIMBURSEMENT FOR WORKERS' COMPENSATION EXPENDITURES

NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

12/29/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

Unknown

12/29/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/25/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

5/2/2017: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/2/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY

5/2/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/12/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/24/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Chang W Hu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Chang W Hu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Chang W Hu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by York Risk Services Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by York Risk Services Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Notice; Filed by York Risk Services Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by York Risk Services Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR REIMBURSEMENT FOR WORKERS' COMPENSATION EXPENDITURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YORK RISK SERVICES GROUP, INC., a foreign corporat is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADE EDMOND D. ESQ.