Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2019 at 00:08:15 (UTC).

YORAM YEHUDA VS NATHAN BEN-SHITRIT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2009 YORAM YEHUDA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATHAN BEN-SHITRIT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK J. JOHNSON, MARIA E. STRATTON, BERT GLENNON, JR, JOHN J. KRALIK and SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3978

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK J. JOHNSON

MARIA E. STRATTON

BERT GLENNON, JR

JOHN J. KRALIK

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

YEHUDA YORAM

ROES 1-20

BEN-SHITRIT NATHAN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

S.B.N. CONSTRUCTION

BEN-SHITRIT NATHAN

TIKOSKY JACOB

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUBIN LEE DAVID

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKE MICHAEL NORMAN

NOVIAN FARID .

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/23/2015: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

7/23/2015: Request for Judicial Notice

Unknown

8/7/2015: Unknown

Minute Order

9/14/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/21/2018: Minute Order

Status Report

10/26/2018: Status Report

Minute Order

11/1/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

11/21/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

11/21/2018: Minute Order

Order

11/21/2018: Order

Notice of Ruling

11/27/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/8/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/8/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Nathan Ben-Shitrit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Final Status Conference and the Trial); Filed by Nathan Ben-Shitrit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Order (Continuing the Final Status Conference and the Trial); Filed by Nathan Ben-Shitrit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Status Report (re: Settlement Negotiations and Trial Setting); Filed by Yoram Yehuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2009
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; (Application-Ex Parte; Granted) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Yoram Yehuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Yoram Yehuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; Initial Status Conference (Conference-Initial Status; Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • Minute order entered: 2009-04-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Yoram Yehuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Complaint; Filed by Yoram Yehuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • Summons-Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC083978    Hearing Date: November 23, 2020    Dept: T

NATHAN BEN-SHITRIT,

Plaintiff,

vs.

JACOB TIKOSKY; et. al.

Defendants,

And related actions...

CASE NO: LC083978 c/w SC122210

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES

Dept. T

8:30 a.m.

November 23, 2020

[TENTATIVE] ORDER: The Motion for Attorney’s Fees in the amount of $87,340.80 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE or in the alternative CONTINUE.

Introduction

Defendant Jacob Tikosky (“Defendant”) moves for an order awarding attorneys’ fees against Plaintiff Nathan Ben-Shitrit (“Plaintiff”) in the amount of $87,340.80. The motion is unopposed.

Discussion

Within the Court’s Statement of Decision, Defendant was ruled to be the prevailing party in relation to attorney’s fees on the Cross-Complaint in LC083978 and the Complaint in consolidated case SC12210. (Statement of Decision, ¿¿3A, B and 4.) Defendant submits his entitlement to attorney’s fees pursuant the Settlement Agreement’s attorney’s fees provision. (Berke Decl. ¿9, Exh. 2: Settlement Agreement, ¿8 – Admitted into evidence as Exhibit 200 in case no. SC122210.) As such, the only issue remaining is to determine whether the amount in fees is reasonable. The Court finds that the amount is not found to be reasonable because Counsel’s declaration, as well as the entries in the invoices, do not reflect the work performed in the defense of the complaint and prosecution of the cross-complaint in case no. SC122210. This action involved several different lawsuits. Without proper itemization of the billing entries showing work performed on SC122210, the Court is at a loss to determine the reasonableness of the fees and/or whether the work performed specifically applied to case no. SC122210.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKE MICHAEL N