This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 14:24:21 (UTC).

YONG JA KIM VS JOHN P CHOMKO ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 YONG JA KIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN P CHOMKO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FREDERICK C. SHALLER and MARY ANN MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3923

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

MARY ANN MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM YONG JA

Defendants and Respondents

CHOMKO JOHN P.

CHOMKO MARY

DOES 1-10

WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BOLSTAD DAVID C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: BREACH CONTRACT; BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF G00D FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 3REACH OF COVENANT OF QUIET EMJOYMENT

3/27/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: BREACH CONTRACT; BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF G00D FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 3REACH OF COVENANT OF QUIET EMJOYMENT

SUMMONS -

3/27/2013: SUMMONS -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

3/27/2013: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JOHN P. CHOMKO, MARY CHOMKO AND WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL, INC.

4/29/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS JOHN P. CHOMKO, MARY CHOMKO AND WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL, INC.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/22/2013: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/9/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/26/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order -

7/26/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

8/6/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

8/28/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTIC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

12/2/2013: NOTIC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/25/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/26/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

6/30/2014: Minute Order -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 46, Frederick C. Shaller, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without prej. entire action ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketOrder-Case Management; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOLSTAD DAVID C. ESQ.