This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:07:56 (UTC).

YOLANDA JENKINS VS PARVIZ PAYGHAMY

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 YOLANDA JENKINS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PARVIZ PAYGHAMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7104

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JENKINS YOLANDA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

PAYGHAMY PARVIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF AZUKA L. UZOH

UZOH AZUKA L.

Defendant Attorney

HOVSEPIAN RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF NOTICE RE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

5/11/2018: DECLARATION OF NOTICE RE: EX-PARTE APPLICATION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND/OR FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON A NOTICE MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITITES;DECLARATION OF AZUKA L. UZOH; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/11/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND/OR FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON A NOTICE MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITITES;DECLARATION OF AZUKA L. UZOH; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

1/28/2019: Ex Parte Application

Order

1/28/2019: Order

Witness List

5/20/2019: Witness List

Exhibit List

5/20/2019: Exhibit List

Minute Order

5/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/28/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/28/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/29/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1.BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

7/14/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1.BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

Unknown

7/26/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

11/23/2016: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/21/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Unknown

12/21/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL, DISCOVERY, AND MOTION CUTOFFS

10/20/2017: NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL, DISCOVERY, AND MOTION CUTOFFS

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Request (for Court Reporter by Party With Fee Waiver); Filed by Yolanda Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Jury Trial (7-Day Estimate) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial 7-Day Estimate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Jury Trial (7-Day Estimate) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Jury Trial (7-Day Estimate) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial 7-Day Estimate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Jury Trial (7-Day Estimate) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • at 2:47 PM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Yolanda Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Yolanda Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Yolanda Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1.BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC627104    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 48

MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE THE ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Yolanda Jenkins

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Defendant Parviz Payghamy

PROOF OF SERVICE: