This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 03:12:19 (UTC).

YING LI VS DAJUN SUN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 YING LI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAJUN SUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4581

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LI YING

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

SUN DAJUN

QUICK KING LOGISTICS CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GIRARDI | KEESE

BELL JEFFREY THOMAS

O'CALLAHAN JAMES G. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LO MICHAEL Y. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA K. GOLD RE OSC DISMISSAL

12/27/2017: DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA K. GOLD RE OSC DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/28/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF JAMES G. O'CALLAHAN RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL; [PROPOSED] ORDERS FOR PUBLICATION AND COMPLETED SERVICE BY MAIL FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH

3/13/2018: DECLARATION OF JAMES G. O'CALLAHAN RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL; [PROPOSED] ORDERS FOR PUBLICATION AND COMPLETED SERVICE BY MAIL FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

5/29/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

5/29/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

6/6/2018: ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

6/6/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/27/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/29/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Substitution of Attorney

3/20/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

3/22/2016: SUMMONS

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

10/30/2017: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

Minute Order

10/31/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

11/22/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal for failure to Default o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by DaJun Sun (Defendant); Quick King Logistics Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Ying Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Ying Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ying Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Answer; Filed by DaJun Sun (Defendant); Quick King Logistics Corp (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Ying Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ying Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC614581    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Kelvin J. Lo seeks to be relieved as counsel for defendants Dajun Sun and Quick King Logistics Corp. (collectively, “Defendants”) on the grounds that the attorney-client relationship has broken down. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Dajun Sun filed a substitution of attorney on November 19, 2019 stating he will be representing himself. Therefore, counsel’s motion as to Dajun Sun is MOOT.

Also on November 19, 2019, Quick King Logistics Corp. filed a substitution of attorney stating it would be representing itself. However, as noted on the substitution of counsel form, a corporation cannot represent itself. Therefore this form is ineffective.

While corporations are prevented from representing themselves, an attorney may be relieved from representation without offending the rule against corporate self-representation. (Thomas G. Ferruzzo, Inc. v. Superior Court (1980) 104 Cal.App.3d 501, 504.) However, trial is in less than two months on January 23, 2020, and Quick King apparently has alternative attorney lined up. This case is three years and eight months old. If counsel withdraws this close to trial without a substitute counsel available, Quick King may have no representation on the trial date. Accordingly, the motion to be relieved as to Quick King is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.