This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 08:33:37 (UTC).

YIHE CALIFORNIA PTY LTD VS LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC ET A

Case Summary

On 03/11/2016 YIHE CALIFORNIA PTY LTD filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3580

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YIHE CALIFORNIA PTY LTD

Defendants and Respondents

LONG DRAGON REALTY GROUP INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HO ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WAYNE S. MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES APC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/11/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. INDEMNITY; ETC

3/11/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. INDEMNITY; ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/24/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Report-Status (JOINT STATUS REPORT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YIHE CALIFORNIA PTY LTD is a litigant