Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:18:46 (UTC).

YEUNG, BILL - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 YEUNG, BILL - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, LESLEY C.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5038

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREEN, LESLEY C.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

YEUNG YI KAY KATHY

YEUNG MICHELLE YEE PUI

YEUNG RONALD YIU CHUNG

Decedent

YEUNG BILL

Interested Party

HO SUI HAR ISABELL

Not Classified By Court

HUTCHINSON ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHIU KEVIN KIN

 

Court Documents

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

10/12/2016: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code)

10/12/2016: Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code)

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

11/3/2016: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Notice - Hearing

11/10/2016: Notice - Hearing

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

12/12/2016: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Supplement - First Supplement To Petition To Determine Succession To Real Property

12/13/2016: Supplement - First Supplement To Petition To Determine Succession To Real Property

Notice - Hearing

12/13/2016: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

12/22/2016: Minute Order

Order - Determining Succession to Real Property

1/30/2017: Order - Determining Succession to Real Property

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2017
  • Order (Determining Succession to Real Property )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • in Probate Department 99, Green, Lesley C., Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Supplement (First Supplement To Petition To Determine Succession To Real Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Inventory & Appraisal (Final ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee; Filed by Probate Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIU KEVIN KIN