This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:25:44 (UTC).

WRIGHT, CHARLOTTE L VS WRIGHT, JOHN W

Case Summary

On 09/16/2016 WRIGHT, CHARLOTTE L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WRIGHT, JOHN W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3479

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WRIGHT CHARLOTTE L

Respondent

WRIGHT JOHN W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Wright, John ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Wright, John ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 12-22-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (fl105;flccs & 2 copies of NAR by mail - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (fl100;110;120 ect... - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte - Signed on 2016-09-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wright, Charlotte ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 12-01-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.