This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 13:18:57 (UTC).

WORTHINGTON, ROIANNE VEACH - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/16/2016 WORTHINGTON, ROIANNE VEACH - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STRATTON, MARIA E. and KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0417

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STRATTON, MARIA E.

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THORNTON CATHERINE

Claimants

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

GRANT & WEBER A CORPORATION

Decedent

WORTHINGTON ROIANNE VEACH

Not Classified By Court

FINCH MARY A.

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHINSKI TOBI J.

Claimant Attorney

DIX LLOYD DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

5/16/2016: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

PR_General Probate

5/16/2016: PR_General Probate

Notice - Hearing

5/25/2016: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/26/2016: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Declaration - of Publication

6/1/2016: Declaration - of Publication

Minute Order

6/17/2016: Minute Order

Bond - Suretec Insurance Company

6/24/2016: Bond - Suretec Insurance Company

Order - Probate

6/24/2016: Order - Probate

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/28/2016: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Letters (Initial) - of Administration

6/28/2016: Letters (Initial) - of Administration

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

7/11/2016: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Notice - To Franchise Tax Board

7/22/2016: Notice - To Franchise Tax Board

Notice - Administration to Creditors

9/8/2016: Notice - Administration to Creditors

Creditor's Claim

10/3/2016: Creditor's Claim

Miscellaneous Document - Confirmation of Receipt of Notice by the Fanchise Tax Board

10/5/2016: Miscellaneous Document - Confirmation of Receipt of Notice by the Fanchise Tax Board

Creditor's Claim - Grant & Weber, A Corporation-Creditor

10/26/2016: Creditor's Claim - Grant & Weber, A Corporation-Creditor

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Capital One- Allowed: $1573.43

3/8/2017: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Capital One- Allowed: $1573.43

Inventory & Appraisal - Final - Property Tax Certificate

3/10/2017: Inventory & Appraisal - Final - Property Tax Certificate

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt of Distributee ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketOrder (Order Settling Waiver of First and Final Account ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (of Tobi J. Chinski re court notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Accounting by Executor ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketBond (Suretec Insurance Company ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less