This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 21:51:04 (UTC).

WORLD GOLD GROUP INC VS DANIEL DERHY

Case Summary

On 05/28/2010 WORLD GOLD GROUP INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against DANIEL DERHY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONALD M. SOHIGIAN, RUTH ANN KWAN and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8815

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

RUTH ANN KWAN

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WORLD GOLD GROUP INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DERHY DANIEL

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

REIF BRANDON S.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/13/2010: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by World Gold Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • DocketNotice; Filed by World Gold Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by World Gold Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2010
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 41; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketIREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CCP 1706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES: 1] CONVERSION;ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by World Gold Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD GOLD GROUP INC AURUM ADVISORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REIF BRANDON SCOTT