This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:45:41 (UTC).

WOODWARD HRT INC VS NEWCO INTERNATIONAL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2016 WOODWARD HRT INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEWCO INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3166

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WOODWARD HRT INC.

Defendants and Respondents

NEWCO INTERNATIONAL INC

KOMFY KINGS INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

NAPOLSKE HOWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ANNAGUEY MARIBETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF LEASE; ETC

9/8/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF LEASE; ETC

SUMMONS

9/8/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/2/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/9/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/9/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/25/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

2/23/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Woodward HRT, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) BREACH OF LEASE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOMFY KINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODWARD HRT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANNAGUEY MARIBETH