This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 04:57:32 (UTC).

WOODLAND HILLS RESTAURANT INC VS MOHSSEN FARD ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2015 WOODLAND HILLS RESTAURANT INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MOHSSEN FARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6160

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Not Classified By Court and Cross Plaintiffs

WOODLAND HILLS RESTAURANT INC.

FARD MOHSSEN

WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC.

ZAKERI FATTANEH

ABOLGHASSEMI SAEED

AFSHARI & SONS INC.

MOSES 1 TO 25

WOODLAND HILLS MEAT MARKET INC

AFSHARI LILI

WOODLAND HILLS DELI MARKET

WOODLAND HILLS PRODUCE MARKET INC.

AFSHARI MEHDI

WOODLAND HILLS BAKERY MARKET INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

FARD MOHSSEN

WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC.

Defendant and Respondent

DOES 1 TO 10

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL & FARAHANI LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MCMILLAN & HERRELL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/19/2015: SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/20/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/21/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/5/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Minute Order

12/3/2015: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF FRANCES M. CAMPBELL RE CONFERRING WITH COUNSEL FOR MOHSSEN FARD AND WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET, INC., PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/19/2016: DECLARATION OF FRANCES M. CAMPBELL RE CONFERRING WITH COUNSEL FOR MOHSSEN FARD AND WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET, INC., PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND COMPEL FURTHER, VERIFIED, RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES ETC.

3/7/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND COMPEL FURTHER, VERIFIED, RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND ETC.

3/7/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO OVERRULE OBJECTIONS AND ETC.

Minute Order

6/9/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE REQUEST FOR FORM INTERROGATORIES [GENERAL] SET NO 2.; SHELLY D. MCMILLAN DECLARATION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,

8/10/2016: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE REQUEST FOR FORM INTERROGATORIES [GENERAL] SET NO 2.; SHELLY D. MCMILLAN DECLARATION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO.1; ETC.

8/17/2016: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET NO.1; ETC.

Minute Order

8/24/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

8/29/2016: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

9/21/2016: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SET NO. 1; SHELLY D. MCMILLAN DECLARATION AND; ETC.

9/26/2016: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SET NO. 1; SHELLY D. MCMILLAN DECLARATION AND; ETC.

Minute Order

10/3/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF MOE KESHAVARZI IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS MEHDI AFSHARI AND LILI AFSHARI'S: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

1/20/2017: DECLARATION OF MOE KESHAVARZI IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS MEHDI AFSHARI AND LILI AFSHARI'S: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS MEHDI AFSHARI AND LILI AFSHARI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES.

9/1/2017: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS MEHDI AFSHARI AND LILI AFSHARI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES.

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 46; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 46; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion for Attorney Fees; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Lili Afshari (Cross-Defendant); MEHDI AFSHARI (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS MEHDI AFSHARI AND LILI AFSHARI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 46; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion for Attorney Fees; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS MEHDI AFSHARI AND LILI AFSHARI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Lili Afshari (Cross-Defendant); MEHDI AFSHARI (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Mohssen Fard (Legacy Party); Woodland Hills Grocery Market, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Woodland Hills Restaurant, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Woodland Hills Restaurant, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODLAND HILLS RESTAURANT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODLAND HILLS GROCERY MARKET INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MOSES 1 TO 20 is a litigant