This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:30:47 (UTC).

WOOD, LLOYD VS WOOD, LAURENE NICASTIO

Case Summary

On 10/24/2016 WOOD, LLOYD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WOOD, LAURENE NICASTIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3736

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WOOD LLOYD

Respondent

WOOD LAURENE NICASTIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MITCHELL GARY ALAN

Respondent Attorney

DION JOSEF MARCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Off Calendar - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (AMENDED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Judgment (AMENDED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2016
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Wood, Laurene - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-14 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (FL-120 - On Behalf of: Respondent: Wood, Laurene - Service Date on 2016-11-14 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (fl105,140,142 ect... - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wood, Lloyd ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wood, Lloyd ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 11-03-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wood, Lloyd ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Wood, Lloyd ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.