This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2019 at 16:21:37 (UTC).

WONG & MAK, LLP VS DARIA WU

Case Summary

On 08/01/2014 WONG MAK, LLP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DARIA WU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7035

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONG & MAK LLP

Defendants

WU DARIA

GUAN PING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONG FRED A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LIU KEVIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • Notice; Filed by WONG & MAK LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (Motion Set Aside Default/Judgment; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Reply; Filed by DARIA WU (Defendant); Ping Guan (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by DARIA WU (Defendant); Ping Guan (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Opposition; Filed by WONG & MAK LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by DARIA WU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (Motion Set Aside Default/Judgment; Continued by Defendant) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Opposition; Filed by WONG & MAK LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Motion for an Order; Filed by DARIA WU (Defendant); Ping Guan (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) (Motion To Set Aside Default; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; (OSC-Failure to File Request Ent of Def; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WONG & MAK LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Default Entered; Filed by WONG & MAK LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by WONG & MAK LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC067035    Hearing Date: November 27, 2019    Dept: O

Plaintiff and Judgment Creditor Wong & Mak, LLC’s motion to amend judgment is DENIED without prejudice for failure to effect proper service. Plaintiff failed to file a proof of service showing valid service, and the Court is not in receipt of any opposition.