This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 00:10:44 (UTC).

WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC. VS. SUNG JIN KIM

Case Summary

On 01/20/2016 WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC filed an Other lawsuit against SUNG JIN KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, BRIAN F. GASDIA, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5294

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

KIM SUNG JIN AN INDIVIDUAL

CHOE ALEXANDER

KIM SUNG

KIM SUNG JIN

LEE EDWARD AN INDIVIDUAL

YU ADOREE AN INDIVIDUAL

LEE AND FIELDS AN BUSINESS ENTITY OF

YU ADOREE

FIELDS CHRISTOPHER

SUNG JIN KIM

LEE EDWARD

FIELDS CHRISTOPHER AN INDIVIDUAL

YU AN INDIVIDUAL ADOREE

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL-DEMURRER SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND SUNG JIN

LEE AN INDIVIDUAL EDWARD

FIELDS AN INDIVIDUAL CHRISTOPHER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHOE ALEXANDER

Not Classified By Court

A-JU TOURS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ISHIMATSU LAW GROUP P.C.

ISHIMATSU BRUCE LESLIE

Defendant Attorneys

LEE HENRY MIN

KUNDANI CHANG KHINDA WILSON LLP

WILSON MICHAEL BERNARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEE HENRY M. LAW CORPORATION

Cross Defendant Attorneys

EDWARD Y. LEE

LEE ANGELA S.

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ED LEE CROSS-DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION FOR TRIAL ON THEIR AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN ADVANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S CASE IN CHIEF

12/10/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ED LEE CROSS-DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION FOR TRIAL ON THEIR AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN ADVANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S CASE IN CHIEF

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike

5/18/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-20 00:00:00

7/20/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-20 00:00:00

Separate Statement

1/29/2018: Separate Statement

Declaration - Declaration of Michael B. Wilson in Support of M.T.C. response to Special Interrogatories

1/29/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Michael B. Wilson in Support of M.T.C. response to Special Interrogatories

Separate Statement

3/2/2018: Separate Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion

4/24/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

5/3/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

7/30/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

8/7/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Request for Judicial Notice -

9/7/2018: Request for Judicial Notice -

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

9/17/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other Separate Trials)

10/18/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other Separate Trials)

Separate Statement - Separate Statement in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

11/29/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

11/29/2018: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

1/22/2019: Separate Statement

Reply - Reply Defendant Sung Jin Kim's Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

2/14/2019: Reply - Reply Defendant Sung Jin Kim's Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED

3/8/2019: Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED

201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • Hearing02/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Hearing01/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:37 AM in Department F; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:23 AM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
556 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVICE ON: ALEXANDER CHOE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (RE SERVICE SERVICE ON: SUNG JIN KIM ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC065294    Hearing Date: December 24, 2019    Dept: SEC

WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS, INC. v. KIM

CASE NO.:  VC065294

HEARING:  12/24/19

#3

TENTATIVE ORDER

Cross-Defendants Lee, Yu, and Lee & Fields’ motion for trial on Cross-Defendants’ affirmative defenses of settlement and release and failure to mitigate damages in advance of Plaintiff’s and/or Cross-Complainant’s case in chief is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Cross-Defendants Lee, Yu, and Lee & Fields move to bifurcate the trial into three phases pursuant to CCP 597.

The motion is DENIED without prejudice. The determination regarding bifurcation is best reserved for the trial judge in this matter.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC. is a litigant