Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2016 at 22:50:58 (UTC).

WIN WIN MAR VS. FELISHA HERRERA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 WIN WIN MAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FELISHA HERRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4693

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAR WIN WIN

Defendant

HERRERA FELISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANDAAL STEVEN R.

WEBER JONATHAN S.

Defendant Attorney

WEINER MARK R. & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2012
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (jury deposit ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Notice (time change ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • Notice (time change ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Notice of Association of Attorneys (Weber and Baer associate with Steven Landaal ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Order-Case Management Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • Answer (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less