This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 01:56:23 (UTC).

WIMATEX INC VS DESIGN BY NATURE LLC

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 WIMATEX INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DESIGN BY NATURE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3707

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WIMATEX INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DESIGN BY NATURE LLC

ITEX

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KAPLAN ALAN I.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PARK DANIEL M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/7/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

6/10/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST

6/10/2016: PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST

STATEMENT OF THE CASE

6/10/2016: STATEMENT OF THE CASE

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

6/16/2016: PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SEUNG CHOON LIM

7/25/2016: DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF SEUNG CHOON LIM

DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/25/2016: DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND

7/26/2016: OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND

JOINT WITNESS LIST

7/29/2016: JOINT WITNESS LIST

JOINT PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST

7/29/2016: JOINT PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST

Minute Order

8/8/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/9/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/16/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF REJECTION - STLPULATED JUDGMENT

8/19/2016: NOTICE OF REJECTION - STLPULATED JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/23/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

8/23/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

9/7/2016: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

11/14/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Wimatex, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Stipulation; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Wimatex, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Design by Nature LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Design by Nature LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Design by Nature LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Wimatex, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ITEX Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Design by Nature, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WIMATEX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A WM TEXTILE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN, ALAN I.