This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:07:15 (UTC).

WILSON A. LOPEZ, ET. AL VS. BANK OF AMERICA, ET. AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2012 WILSON A LOPEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6187

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ LISBETH

LOPEZ WILSON A.

Defendants

ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2006

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. AS SUCCESSOR BY THE

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MORTGAGE PASS

RECONTRUST COMPANY

THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2006-OA21

MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES

Others

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE - Defendant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSUMER PROTECTION ASSISTANCE

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID POWELL

SEVERSON & WERSON

BLANK ROME LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2012
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT DISMISSING LAWSUIT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Order (ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE: PLAINTIFFS' FAC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Notice of Motion (AND MTN FOR JUDGMT ON THE PLEADINGS RE: PLNTFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NTC IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR JUDGMT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO PLNTFFS' FAC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • Opposition (TO OSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF MARILYN YEE, ESZ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Order (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF AYANI YANEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Proof of Service (re reliminary injunction ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • ExParte Application (FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.