This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:48:17 (UTC).

WILSHIRE VERMONT HOUSING PARTNERS LP VS LEXINGTON INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 08/02/2016 WILSHIRE VERMONT HOUSING PARTNERS LP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9273

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE VERMONT HOUSING PARTNERS LP

Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

IRONSHORE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

STARR SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

ALTERRA BERMUDA LIMITED

QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

TOKIO MARINE & NICHIDO FIRE INSURANCE CO

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADY MATTHEW

KNOTT STEVEN E.

STANTON DAVID LONGJOHN

COTKIN JOAN MARIE MAJARIAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CHURAN AMY M.

BAKAL-CAPLAN EMILIE

TAKETA KENNETH R.

GROSS JONATHAN RIAN

LINCOLN CHRISTINA MARIE

O'CONNOR SEAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Other -

12/26/2017: Other -

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/10/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling

1/22/2018: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order

1/31/2018: Stipulation and Order

Other -

2/5/2018: Other -

Other -

2/14/2018: Other -

Order

2/20/2018: Order

Stipulation and Order

2/26/2018: Stipulation and Order

Declaration

3/13/2018: Declaration

Other -

3/13/2018: Other -

Other -

3/13/2018: Other -

Order

3/20/2018: Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/20/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

3/20/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/21/2018: Notice of Ruling

Objection

3/26/2018: Objection

Response

3/28/2018: Response

Other -

5/8/2018: Other -

151 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Stay on Discovery on Issues of Bad Faith Should Not Be Lifted)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketMessage Board Posting (re: 5/24/2019 Time of Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to impose bad faith order/similar) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (For Relief From Waiver Of Payment Of Jury Fees) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (For Relief From Waiver of Right to Jury Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (For Relief From Waiver Of Payment Of Jury Fees) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (to impose bad faith order/similar) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why The Stay On Discovery On Issues Of Bad Faith Should Not Be Lifted) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (of Plaintiff's Motion For Relief from Waiver of Right to Jury Trial); Filed by Wilshire Vermont Housing Partners, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
315 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF INSURANCE CONTRACT AND BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wilshire Vermont Housing Partners, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE VERMONT HOUSING PARTNERS LP COMP OF ALAN BOGOMILSKY & JOHN HEOVAT is a litigant

Latest cases where Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Co Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A MISSOURI CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STARR SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant