This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 11:23:13 (UTC).

WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY VS MANGEN GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MANGEN GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN J. GOODMAN and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7579

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

MANGEN GROUP INC.

B.E.D. PARTNERS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT L. WHITMAN INC. APLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS WITH COURT PER COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER, WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS

1/19/2016: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS WITH COURT PER COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER, WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER AND ASSERTION OF LIEN ON INTERPLEADED FUNDS

1/19/2016: VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER AND ASSERTION OF LIEN ON INTERPLEADED FUNDS

SUMMONS

1/19/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/29/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

2/29/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/29/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/6/2016: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS (I) DIRECTING CLERK TO DISTRIBUTE INTERPLED FUNDS PER PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ETC

5/6/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS (I) DIRECTING CLERK TO DISTRIBUTE INTERPLED FUNDS PER PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ETC

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SCOTT L. WHITMAN RE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS, ETC.

5/12/2016: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SCOTT L. WHITMAN RE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS, ETC.

Minute Order

5/12/2016: Minute Order

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS (I) DIRECTING CLERK TO DISTRIBUTE INTERPLED FUNDS PER PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ETC

5/12/2016: ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS (I) DIRECTING CLERK TO DISTRIBUTE INTERPLED FUNDS PER PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ETC

Unknown

5/13/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS (II) DIRECTING CLERK TO DISTRIBUTE INTERPLED FUNDS PER PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; (II) ADVANCE AND TAKE OFF CALENDAR CASE MANAGEMENT CO

5/13/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS (II) DIRECTING CLERK TO DISTRIBUTE INTERPLED FUNDS PER PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; (II) ADVANCE AND TAKE OFF CALENDAR CASE MANAGEMENT CO

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • Notice (OF ORDS ON EX PARTE APPLIC ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Supplemental Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Order Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Notice of Conference Date Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MANGEN GROUP INC. is a litigant