This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:59:23 (UTC).

WILLIE MAYORA VS HSBC BANK USA ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 WILLIE MAYORA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HSBC BANK USA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9248

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAYORA WILLIE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

HOUSER & ALLISON

HSBC BANK USA

LUDEMAN PATRICK S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WRIGHT ROBIN PREMA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/24/2015: SUMMONS

VERIFIED CLAIM IN THE STYLE OF COMPLANT FOR: 1. FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION: SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE OF RESIDENTIAL PURCHASE AGREEMENT; ALTERNATIVELY; ETC

7/24/2015: VERIFIED CLAIM IN THE STYLE OF COMPLANT FOR: 1. FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION: SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE OF RESIDENTIAL PURCHASE AGREEMENT; ALTERNATIVELY; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/4/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE OF THE FIELDSTONE MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST, SERIES 2006-1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/15/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE OF THE FIELDSTONE MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST, SERIES 2006-1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/15/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES,ETC.

10/29/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES,ETC.

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/9/2015: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order

11/23/2015: Minute Order

RULING

11/23/2015: RULING

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/24/2015: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

[PROPOED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

12/8/2015: [PROPOED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/8/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

12/15/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

12/17/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

12/17/2015: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF RULING

1/5/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF RULING

2/5/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

2/26/2016: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Houser & Allison (Defendant); Patrick S. Ludeman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Houser & Allison (Defendant); Patrick S. Ludeman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate (Motion to Consolidate; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by HSBC Bank USA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE OF THE FIELDSTONE MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST, SERIES 2006-1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Willie Mayora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • VERIFIED NOTICE OF PENDNG ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • VERIFIED CLAIM IN THE STYLE OF COMPLANT FOR: 1. FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION: SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE OF RESIDENTIAL PURCHASE AGREEMENT; ALTERNATIVELY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSER & ALLISON is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT ROBIN PREMA ESQ.